Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Ignacy Riaucour

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1700BornWarszawa
16 Mar 172626.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 174949.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
3 Mar 174949.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
1 Jun 174949.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
Nov 177777.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Ignacy Riaucour:
Bishop Ludwik Ignacy Riaucour (born , died Nov 1777) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,877
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015