Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Chrzciciel Zamoyski, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateEventTitle
1615ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Jul 1633AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
6 Dec 1649AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
19 Oct 1654AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
1 Jan 1655DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Chrzciciel Zamoyski:
Bishop Jan Chrzciciel Zamoyski O.P. (died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 107
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,935

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014