Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Zygmunt Szczęsny Feliński

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1822Born
13 Feb 185532.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Zytomir, Ukraine
8 Sep 185532.8Ordained PriestPriest of Zytomir, Ukraine
6 Jan 186239.2AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
26 Jan 186239.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
9 Feb 186239.3InstalledArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
15 Mar 188360.4ResignedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
15 Mar 188360.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
15 Sep 189572.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
17 Aug 2002Beatified
11 Oct 2009Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Zygmunt Szczęsny Feliński (VIAF: 71428560)
Archbishop St. Zygmunt Szczęsny Feliński (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWojutyn, Diocese of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
Ordained BishopSt. Jean de Jerusalem, St. Petersburg

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • cano: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,687
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537, and Page 583
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017