Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Karaś (Karosas)

Deceased

Bishop of Vilkaviškis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1856BornOniksztensi
26 Jun 188327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
12 Nov 190650.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
12 Nov 190650.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
16 Jun 190751.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
7 Apr 191054.1AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
29 Jun 191054.3InstalledBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
5 Apr 192670.1AppointedBishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
7 Jul 194791.4DiedBishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Anton Karaś (Karosas):
Bishop Anton Karaś (Karosas) (born , died ) Bishop of Vilkaviškis

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,808
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013