Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Łoza

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Titular Bishop of Argos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornLozi
26 Mar 163259.2SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
12 Jun 163461.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
12 Jun 163461.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
4 Mar 163562.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
1639²66.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Łoza:
Bishop Stanisław Łoza (born 1573, died 1639) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 94
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,938
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015