Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Franciszek Ksawery Rostkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1660³BornJeduabrun
27 May 168424.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 170039.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
10 May 170039.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
5 Mar 173877.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Franciszek Ksawery Rostkowski:
Bishop Adam Franciszek Ksawery Rostkowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 53.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 313
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015