Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Stefan Wydżga

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610BornLviv
14 May 165545.3AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
24 Oct 165545.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
18 Aug 165949.6SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
10 Nov 165949.8ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
6 Jan 166050.0InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Jul 167969.5AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
7 Sep 168575.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Stefan Wydżga:
Archbishop Jan Stefan Wydżga (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015