Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitaliy Skomarovskyi

Bishop of Lutsk

Apostolic Administrator of Kyiv-Zhytomyr


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1963 BornBerdychiv
27 May 199026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine
7 Apr 200339.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine
7 Apr 200339.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
7 Jun 200339.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
12 Apr 201450.2AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
17 May 201450.3InstalledBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
31 May 201652.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Vitaliy Skomarovskyi
Bishop Vitaliy Skomarovskyi (born ) Bishop of Lutsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lutsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,406
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 May 2016