Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Benedykt Wyhowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1652³Born
1681²28.7Ordained PriestPriest
170148.7SelectedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
1 Oct 170351.5ConfirmedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
18 Nov 170351.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
28 Dec 171462.7DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Benedykt Wyhowski
Bishop Aleksander Benedykt Wyhowski (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamość
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Varsovie

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1703, Number 24
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,609
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast