Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Leżeński

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603²BornMassovicz
1 Apr 165855.3AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
2 Feb 165956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
5 Sep 166764.7AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
1675²72.0DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Leżeński:
Bishop Tomasz Leżeński , Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 147
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,949

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014