Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henryk Firlej

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹Born
30 May 161642.4AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
9 Jan 161743.0AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
7 Oct 162450.7AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
25 Feb 162652.1DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henryk Firlej
Archbishop Henryk Firlej (born 1574, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalice

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018