Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyril Lubowidzki

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1823BornDrochowa
22 Mar 184723.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Aug 184724.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188460.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
24 Mar 188460.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
29 Jun 188461.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dulma
2 Aug 189774.0AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
9 Jun 189874.9DiedBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Cyril Lubowidzki:
Bishop Cyril Lubowidzki (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,791
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 253, and Page 351
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013