Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wiktoryn Wierzbicki

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
8 Jun 156545.4AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
22 Aug 156747.6AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
10 Feb 158767.1DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wiktoryn Wierzbicki
Bishop Wiktoryn Wierzbicki (born 1520, died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarmia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229, and Page 239
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018