Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronim Antoni Szeptycki

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1700³BornWyzlanen
17 Aug 172727.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 172727.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 173939.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
20 Jul 173939.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae
11 Oct 1739³39.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saldae
10 Aug 175959.2SelectedBishop of Płock, Poland
24 Sep 175959.3ConfirmedBishop of Płock, Poland
9 Aug 178383.2DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hieronim Antoni Szeptycki:
Bishop Hieronim Antoni Szeptycki (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 342, and Page 363
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015