Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Goss

Deceased

Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1814Born
27 Jun 184126.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lancashire District, England, Great Britain
4 Jul 184126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lancashire District, England, Great Britain
29 Jul 185339.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
29 Jul 185339.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
25 Sep 185339.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
25 Jan 185641.5SucceededBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
3 Oct 187258.2DiedBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Goss (VIAF: 30296728)
Bishop Alexander Goss (born , died ) Bishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrmskirk, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopSaint Nicholas Pro-Cathedral, Liverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 284, and Page 347
  • c34: CB, 10 Nov 2014
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 102
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,296
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017