Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Sharples

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lancashire District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1797Born
20 May 182325.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
30 Nov 182326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
11 Aug 184345.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lancashire District, England, Great Britain
11 Aug 184345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
15 Aug 184345.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
11 Aug 185052.8DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lancashire District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Sharples
Bishop James Sharples (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lancashire District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSant’Agata dei Goti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSingleton-in-the-Fylde, Preston, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Cemetery, Great Eccleston, Preston, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District, England

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 332
  • b/c4: Arundel to Zabi, Page 179
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1843, Number 40
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018