Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Leeds

Dioecesis Loidensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marcus Nigel Stock, Bishop
  • David Every Konstant, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 20 December 1878
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Liverpool
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: England
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 5,033 (1,943 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprising: County of West Yorkshire and parts of North Yorkshire, Cumbria, Greater Manchester, Humberside and Lancashire.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofleeds.org.uk/
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Curial Offices, Hinsley Hall, 62 Headingley Lane, Leeds LS6 2BX, England, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (0113)261-8000
  • Fax: 261-8035

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Yorkshire District
1840ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern District Vicariate Apostolic of Yorkshire District (erected)
Diocese of Beverley
29 September 1850ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Yorkshire District Diocese of Beverley
20 December 1878Territory LostDiocese of Beverley Diocese of Middlesbrough (erected)
Diocese of Leeds
20 December 1878Name ChangedDiocese of Beverley Diocese of Leeds
30 May 1980Territory LostDiocese of Leeds
Diocese of Nottingham
Diocese of Hallam (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Leeds
1950179,0003,354,3955.3%2845433852959761141ap1951
1970258,2843,641,2287.1%3106237269467742182ap1971
1980269,5003,655,0007.4%29865363742476779187ap1981
1990192,8002,169,0008.9%19534229841538313129ap1991
1999172,4742,200,0007.8%194112058411916212130ap2000
2000166,9582,000,0008.3%187101978471912199125ap2001
2001157,9572,000,0007.9%18581938181911192124ap2002
2002155,0352,000,0007.8%18691957952111176124ap2003
2003155,0352,000,0007.8%185111967902114172124ap2004
2004154,9572,000,0007.7%187162037632418191124ap2005
2013157,7662,068,0007.6%1757182866241313686ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Sep 2014