Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Malone

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Abora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1931Born
18 Sep 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
13 May 198957.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
13 May 198957.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abora
3 Jul 198957.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abora
26 Oct 200675.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
18 May 202088.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Malone
Bishop Vincent Malone (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOld Swan, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestSt. Oswald, Church, Old Swan, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Death PlaceRoyal Liverpool, Hospital, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)Allerton, Cemetery, Garston, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,354
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • d.loc: CL, 7 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jul 2020

Quantcast