Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Wulstan Pearson, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lancaster, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1870BornPreston, Lancashire
12 Dec 189020.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Sep 189727.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 192455.0AppointedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
24 Feb 192555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
1 Dec 193868.9DiedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Wulstan Pearson:
Bishop Thomas Wulstan Pearson O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Lancaster

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 10
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014