Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Cox, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1848BornBirkenhead, Great Britain
20 Dec 187325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Jul 191466.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Transvaal, South Africa
15 Jul 191466.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
28 Oct 191466.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
14 Jul 192476.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Transvaal, South Africa
9 Mar 193687.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Charles Cox:
Bishop Charles Cox O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013