Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Harris

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1917Born
30 May 194224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 196548.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 196548.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Socia
11 Feb 196648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Socia
10 Nov 197861.0AppointedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
3 Nov 199275.0RetiredBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
30 Aug 200789.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Augustine Harris
Bishop Augustine Harris (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWest Derby, Liverpool, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopCrypt, Christ the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Death PlaceInce Blundell Hall, Convent, Crosby, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cathedral, Coulby Newham, Middlesbrough, Cleveland, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast