Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Hart, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Malakal, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1908Born
17 Jul 193224.1Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
13 Jun 194739.0AppointedPrefect of Kodok, Sudan
196253.6ResignedPrefect of Malakal, Sudan
29 Aug 198274.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Malakal, Sudan

MicroData Summary for John Hart
Father John Hart M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Malakal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceHerbert House, Formby, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 50.1 years

Source(s):
  • loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast