Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Bernard Cotter

Deceased

Bishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1844Born
3 May 187126.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 188945.0AppointedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
27 Dec 188945.1Ordained BishopBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
28 Jun 190964.6DiedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bernard Cotter
Bishop Joseph Bernard Cotter (born , died ) Bishop of Winona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 599
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017