Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Augustine O’Neill, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis, Mauritius

Titular Bishop of Isinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1841Born
10 Dec 186119.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Apr 186725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 May 189654.4AppointedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
29 Jun 189654.5Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
26 Nov 190967.9ResignedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
26 Nov 190967.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Isinda
6 Nov 191169.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Port-Louis, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for Peter Augustine O’Neill
Bishop Peter Augustine O’Neill O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopBelmont

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 467
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Mar 2018