Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Sherrington

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Hilta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1958 Born
13 Jun 198729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
30 Jun 201153.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
30 Jun 201153.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
14 Sep 201153.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hilta

MicroData Summary for John Francis Sherrington
Bishop John Francis Sherrington (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeicester, Leicestershire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Thomas More, Church, Leicester, Leicestershire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Westminster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2011
  • ob: CB, 30 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 5 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,140
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast