Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1824Born
19 Dec 184622.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
9 May 184722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
28 Feb 187348.7AppointedBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
19 Mar 187348.7Ordained BishopBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 189469.8DiedBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Bernard O’Reilly (VIAF: 316388648)
Bishop Bernard O’Reilly (born , died ) Bishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallybeg, County Meath, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained BishopS. Vincent de Paul, Church, Liverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Death PlaceSt. Edward, College, Everton, Liverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 347
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 161
  • b/od/c0: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 14
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast