Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Carmel Cardinal Heenan

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1905Born
6 Jul 193025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
27 Jan 195146.0AppointedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
12 Mar 195146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
2 May 195752.2AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
16 Jul 195752.4InstalledArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
2 Sep 196358.6AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
22 Feb 196560.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196560.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
7 Nov 197570.7DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Carmel Heenan (VIAF: 61674741)
John Carmel Cardinal Heenan (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlford, Essex, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Church, Ilford, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England
Ordained BishopSt. Anne, Cathedral, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Death PlaceChelsea and Westminster, Hospital, Chelsea, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)12 Station, Most Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 17
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 117, and Page 118
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast