Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony Rawsthorne

Bishop Emeritus of Hallam, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1936 Born
16 Jun 196225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 198144.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 198144.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
16 Dec 198145.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotdon
4 Jun 199760.5AppointedBishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain
20 May 201477.5RetiredBishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Anthony Rawsthorne
Bishop John Anthony Rawsthorne (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hallam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrosby, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, College, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hallam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2014
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 6 Feb 2018