Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Altham Kelly

Archbishop Emeritus of Liverpool, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1938 BornMorecambe
18 Feb 196223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
9 Mar 198445.3AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
3 Apr 198445.4Ordained BishopBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
21 May 199657.5AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 199657.6InstalledArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
27 Feb 201374.3ResignedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Altham Kelly:
Archbishop Patrick Altham Kelly (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Liverpool

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Liverpool.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Website of the Diocese, 19 Dec 2011
  • op: CB, 20 Dec 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Nov 2014