Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas Jackson, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Labuan e Borneo, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1846Born
28 Sep 187933.6Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
1881²34.8AppointedPrefect of Labuan e Borneo, Malaysia
1896¹49.8ResignedPrefect of Labuan e Borneo, Malaysia
1 Apr 191670.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Labuan e Borneo, Malaysia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Jackson
Father Thomas Jackson M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Labuan e Borneo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreston, Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph's, College, Mill Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast