Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Joseph Downey

Deceased

Archbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1881Born
25 May 190726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
3 Aug 192847.2AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 192847.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
16 Jun 195372.1DiedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Joseph Downey (VIAF: 68584654)
Archbishop Richard Joseph Downey (born , died ) Archbishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny City, County Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopSt. Nicholas, Pro-Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Death PlaceGateacre Grange, Convent, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Christ the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 61
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 83
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast