Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Richard Gallagher

Secretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Hodelm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1954 Born
31 Jul 197723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
18 Aug 200046.5AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
22 Jan 200449.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hodelm
22 Jan 200449.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
13 Mar 200450.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hodelm
19 Feb 200955.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
11 Dec 201258.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Australia
8 Nov 201460.7AppointedSecretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Paul Richard Gallagher (VIAF: 9146937740413830820)
Archbishop Paul Richard Gallagher (born ) Secretary (Relations with States) of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Secretariat of State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,545
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2014
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 10 Oct 2019

Quantcast