Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Verdon

Deceased

Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand


from Cathedral Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1838Born
1861¹22.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 189657.6AppointedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
3 May 189657.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
22 Nov 191880.4DiedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Verdon (VIAF: 315945692)
Bishop Michael Verdon (born , died ) Bishop of Dunedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Dunedin, Diocese of Dunedin

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 253
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017