Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Bernard Pearson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lancaster, England

Titular Bishop of Sinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1907BornPreston
1 Nov 193326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
14 May 194942.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
14 May 194942.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinda
25 Jul 194942.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinda
31 Oct 198376.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 198780.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Bernard Pearson:
Bishop Thomas Bernard Pearson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lancaster

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013