Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Forest Hogan, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bellary, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1895Born
31 Jul 192731.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Aug 193438.8AppointedSuperior of Bellary, India
10 Mar 194953.4AppointedBishop of Bellary, India
4 May 194953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bellary, India
23 Sep 196266.9DiedBishop of Bellary, India

MicroData Summary for John Forest Hogan
Bishop John Forest Hogan O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bellary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Great Britain

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast