Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Anthony Williams

Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Mageó


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1948 Born
27 May 197224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
15 Apr 200355.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
15 Apr 200355.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mageó
27 May 200355.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mageó
27 Feb 201365.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
1 May 201466.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Anthony Williams (VIAF: 229562799)
Bishop Thomas Anthony Williams (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVauxhall, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Liverpool.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,385
  • r: CB, 21 Mar 2014
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 6 Feb 2018