Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Hilary Brown

Deceased

Bishop of Liverpool, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1786BornClifton in the Fylde
14 Dec 180822.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 181024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 184054.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lancashire District, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 184054.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bugia
24 Aug 184054.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bugia
22 Apr 184256.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
29 Sep 185064.7AppointedBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 185064.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Salford, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185165.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Salford, England, Great Britain
25 Jan 185670.0DiedBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Hilary Brown
Bishop George Hilary Brown (born , died ) Bishop of Liverpool

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 347, and Page 492
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 121, and Page 372
  • b/op: Arundel to Zabi, Page 45
  • od/c01: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • aadm/salf: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016