Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Derek John Harford Worlock

Deceased

Archbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1920Born
3 Jun 194424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
18 Oct 196545.7AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
21 Dec 196545.8Ordained BishopBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
7 Feb 197656.0AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 199676.0DiedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Derek John Harford Worlock (VIAF: 47644709)
Archbishop Derek John Harford Worlock (born , died ) Archbishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. John's Wood, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Death PlaceLourdes, Hospital, Mossley Hill, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)Christ the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 221
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast