Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gerald Holland, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Keta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1905BornLiverpool, Great Britain
10 Jun 192822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
11 Jul 194640.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Volta Inferiore, Ghana
11 Jul 194640.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
13 Oct 194641.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
18 Apr 195044.5AppointedBishop of Keta, Ghana
7 May 195347.6ResignedBishop of Keta, Ghana
7 May 195347.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Aegypto
7 Dec 197065.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Aegypto
14 Apr 1972³66.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Keta, Ghana

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gerald Holland:
Bishop Joseph Gerald Holland S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Keta

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015