Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Hitchen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Othona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1930Born
17 Jul 195525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
28 May 197949.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
28 May 197949.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Othona
3 Jul 197949.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Othona
10 Apr 198857.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Hitchen (VIAF: 75384785)
Bishop Anthony Hitchen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChorley, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Church, Chorley, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Death Place55 Victoria Road, Formby, Liverpool, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Gregory, Church, Weld Bank, Chorley, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 123
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast