Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin O’Connor

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Glastonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1929Born
12 Jun 195425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
28 May 197949.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
28 May 197949.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Glastonia
3 Jul 197950.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Glastonia
5 May 199363.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Kevin O’Connor
Bishop Kevin O’Connor (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKirkdale, Liverpool, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Death PlaceFleetwood, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Buried Place (Original)Sts. Peter and Paul, Cemetery, Great Crosby, Liverpool, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 160
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast