Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Miklósy

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1739³Born
30 Aug 176122.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 176223.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 180162.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
20 Jul 180162.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
15 Nov 180162.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
28 Jan 180363.7SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
20 Jun 180364.1ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
22 Jun 181172.1DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Miklósy
Bishop Ferenc Miklósy (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCsákvár

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 371, and Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast