Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Bodona


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1498AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
19 Jan 1498AppointedTitular Bishop of Bodona
2 Feb 1498Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bodona

MicroData Summary for György
Bishop György , Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanto Spirito in Sassia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 108
  • ob/c2+: ATh, 3 Oct 2018
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1498, Number 1
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast