Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferenc Fuchs

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1744BornPandorfen
25 Feb 176823.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 May 176823.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 178742.9SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
10 Mar 178843.5ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
13 Apr 178843.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
23 Mar 180459.5SelectedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
20 Aug 180459.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
27 Jun 180762.8DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Fuchs
Archbishop Ferenc Fuchs (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,784
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016