Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flórián Kovács

Deceased

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1754³Born
5 Apr 177823.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Apr 177823.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 182167.6SelectedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
19 Apr 182267.9ConfirmedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
21 Jul 182268.2Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
11 Dec 182571.5DiedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Flórián Kovács
Bishop Flórián Kovács (born , died ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiósgyör, Diocese of Eger, Hungary
Ordained BishopSzatmár, Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 1 Oct 2020

Quantcast