Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ján Krstitel Ladislav Pyrker (Pryker), O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1772³BornNagyláng, Hungary
3 Dec 179624.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Cistercians
4 Dec 179624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
7 Aug 181845.8SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
21 Dec 181846.1ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
18 Apr 181946.5Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
12 May 181946.5InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
23 May 182047.6SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
2 Oct 182047.9ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
17 Nov 182654.0SelectedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
9 Apr 182754.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
2 Dec 184775.1DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ján Krstitel Ladislav Pyrker (Pryker):
Archbishop Ján Krstitel Ladislav Pyrker (Pryker) O. Cist. (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 63, and Page 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 391
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013