Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sandor Párvy

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1848BornGyöngyös, Hungary
20 Jul 187122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
8 Oct 187123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
27 Mar 190354.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
27 Mar 190354.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
19 Apr 190354.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
25 Jun 190455.7AppointedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
11 Sep 190455.9InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
24 Mar 191970.5DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Sandor Párvy:
Bishop Sandor Párvy (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013