Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Keszthelyi, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1928BornEger
2 Apr 195123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
11 Feb 199263.9AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
21 Mar 199264.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
27 Mar 200375.0RetiredBishop of Vác, Hungary
6 Dec 201082.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Keszthelyi:
Bishop Ferenc Keszthelyi O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vác

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,662
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013