Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Bémer de Bezdéd et Kisbáka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1788³Born
12 Feb 181122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
13 Apr 181123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
10 Feb 184354.8SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
3 Apr 184354.9ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
14 May 184355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
1850¹61.7ResignedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
4 Nov 186274.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László Bémer de Bezdéd et Kisbáka
Bishop László Bémer de Bezdéd et Kisbáka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKisbáka

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 389
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast