Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Imre Cardinal Csáky

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1672Born
18 Dec 169422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 169623.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 170330.6AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
3 Aug 170330.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
19 Nov 171442.0AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
12 Jul 171744.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
1 Oct 171744.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 172148.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
28 Aug 173259.8DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Imre Csáky
Imre Cardinal Csáky (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle, Zips (Spis) Szepesváre, Diocese of Eger
Ordained BishopWien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Death PlaceCastle, Skalca

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
  • a cardinal for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1717
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,577
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 22
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,472

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast